Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Housing and Community Development, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0337)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 /CH0082
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program - Project Proposals
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0192 (SB0156)
Title
Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389
Title
Lead Safe Income Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0487)
Title
Home Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 /CH0545 (SB0764/CH0544)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 /CH0657
Title
Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 /CH0593 (SB0965/CH0592)
Title
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1489 (SB0935)
Title
Housing - Energy-Efficient and Green Homes - Construction Financing
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 /CH0011
Title
Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans - Financial Assistance for Families of Limited Income
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 /CH0013
Title
Community Legacy Program - Application Requirements - Approval by Authorized Designee
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156 (HB0192)
Title
Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program Fund
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 (HB0045)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 (HB0603)
Title
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of Income
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764 /CH0544 (HB0823/CH0545)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0935 (HB1489)
Title
Housing - Energy-Efficient and Green Homes - Construction Financing
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965 /CH0592 (HB1170/CH0593)
Title
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 (SB0337) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0108 /CH0082 Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program - Project Proposals Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Environmental Matters
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0192 (SB0156) Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program Fund Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0389 Lead Safe Income Tax Credit Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 (SB0487) Home Act of 2013 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0823 /CH0545 (SB0764/CH0544) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0957 /CH0657 Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1170 /CH0593 (SB0965/CH0592) Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund Workgroup Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1489 (SB0935) Housing - Energy-Efficient and Green Homes - Construction Financing Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0060 /CH0011 Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans - Financial Assistance for Families of Limited Income Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0062 /CH0013 Community Legacy Program - Application Requirements - Approval by Authorized Designee Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0156 (HB0192) Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program Fund Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0337 (HB0045) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 (HB0603) Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of Income Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0764 /CH0544 (HB0823/CH0545) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0935 (HB1489) Housing - Energy-Efficient and Green Homes - Construction Financing Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0965 /CH0592 (HB1170/CH0593) Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund Workgroup Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM