Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Housing and Community Development, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045
Title
Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required Redemption
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Funding for Newly Constructed Single-Family Homes
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134 /CH0105
Title
Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0728)
Title
Home Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0644 (SB0180/CH0229)
Title
Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0689 (SB0813)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Rental Assistance Programs - Duration of Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
The Smoke-Free Multifamily Housing Promotion Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059
Title
Task Force to Study the Effect of Section 8 Housing on Neighborhoods in Baltimore County
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1119 (SB0641)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland - Credit Amounts
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181
Title
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311 (SB0722)
Title
Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345 /CH0523
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1492 /CH0636
Title
Housing and Community Development - Food Deserts - Small Loans
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1514 (SB0812)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180 /CH0229 (HB0644)
Title
Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 /CH0642
Title
Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB1119)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland - Credit Amounts
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB1311)
Title
Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 (HB1514)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB0689)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Rental Assistance Programs - Duration of Assistance
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required Redemption Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0106 Department of Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0107 Department of Housing and Community Development - Funding for Newly Constructed Single-Family Homes Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0134 /CH0105 Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0172 (SB0728) Home Act of 2017 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0644 (SB0180/CH0229) Independent Living Tax Credit Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0689 (SB0813) Department of Housing and Community Development - Rental Assistance Programs - Duration of Assistance Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0855 The Smoke-Free Multifamily Housing Promotion Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1059 Task Force to Study the Effect of Section 8 Housing on Neighborhoods in Baltimore County Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1119 (SB0641) Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland - Credit Amounts Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1181 Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1311 (SB0722) Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1345 /CH0523 National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1492 /CH0636 Housing and Community Development - Food Deserts - Small Loans Delegate Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1514 (SB0812) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0180 /CH0229 (HB0644) Independent Living Tax Credit Act Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0445 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0625 /CH0642 Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0641 (HB1119) Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland - Credit Amounts Senator Manno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0722 (HB1311) Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0812 (HB1514) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0813 (HB0689) Department of Housing and Community Development - Rental Assistance Programs - Duration of Assistance Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM