Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Howard County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 (SB0131)
Title
County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 /CH0532 (SB0846)
Title
Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 (SB0551)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590 /CH0150
Title
Howard County Board of Education – Election of Members Ho. Co. 01–19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0591
Title
Howard County Board of Education - School Year - Start and End Dates Ho. Co. 25-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0731)
Title
Build to Learn Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 /CH0701
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Marketplace License Ho. Co. 06–19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1166 /CH0725
Title
Howard County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags Ho. Co. 04-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306 /CH0151
Title
Howard County - Howard County Housing Commission - Subsidiary Entities Ho. Co. 26-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1405 /CH0311
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Collection by Director of Finance Ho. Co. 30-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406 /CH0152
Title
Howard County - Department of Correction - Authority to Establish Programs Ho. Co. 29-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 /CH0744
Title
Howard County - School Facilities Surcharge - Rates Ho. Co. 03-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0131 (HB0053)
Title
County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551 (HB0263)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0653 /CH0528
Title
Carroll and Howard County Boards of Education – Establishing Innovative Regional Schools – Authority (Cross–County Attendance to Achieve Efficiency Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 (HB0116/CH0532)
Title
Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0053 (SB0131) County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0116 /CH0532 (SB0846) Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
HB0263 (SB0551) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0340 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0590 /CH0150 Howard County Board of Education – Election of Members Ho. Co. 01–19 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Ways and Means
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0591 Howard County Board of Education - School Year - Start and End Dates Ho. Co. 25-19 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0727 (SB0731) Build to Learn Act of 2019 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0869 /CH0701 Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Marketplace License Ho. Co. 06–19 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1166 /CH0725 Howard County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags Ho. Co. 04-19 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 /CH0151 Howard County - Howard County Housing Commission - Subsidiary Entities Ho. Co. 26-19 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1405 /CH0311 Howard County - Transfer Tax - Collection by Director of Finance Ho. Co. 30-19 Howard County Delegation 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Ways and Means
3/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1406 /CH0152 Howard County - Department of Correction - Authority to Establish Programs Ho. Co. 29-19 Howard County Delegation 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 /CH0744 Howard County - School Facilities Surcharge - Rates Ho. Co. 03-19 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 744
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0131 (HB0053) County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0551 (HB0263) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0653 /CH0528 Carroll and Howard County Boards of Education – Establishing Innovative Regional Schools – Authority (Cross–County Attendance to Achieve Efficiency Act of 2019) Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 (HB0116/CH0532) Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM