Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Rights

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241 (SB0904)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 /CH0091 (SB0521)
Title
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 /CH0341 (SB0335/CH0340)
Title
Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0905
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 (SJ0003)
Title
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 /CH0340 (HB0847/CH0341)
Title
Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region Fees
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 /CH0357
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB0456/CH0091)
Title
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904 (HB0241)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0008)
Title
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0241 (SB0904) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0456 /CH0091 (SB0521) Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0847 /CH0341 (SB0335/CH0340) Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region Fees Delegate Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0905 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HJ0008 (SJ0003) Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
SB0335 /CH0340 (HB0847/CH0341) Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region Fees Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0520 /CH0357 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0521 (HB0456/CH0091) Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking Senator Lee 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 (HB0241) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SJ0003 (HJ0008) Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM