Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Institutions (I1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558 /CH0095 (SB0515)
Title
Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692
Title
College Savings Plans of Maryland - Maryland College Savings Account Plan - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Disclosure of Financial Records - Federal Investigation Agencies
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0515 (HB0558/CH0095)
Title
Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0558 /CH0095 (SB0515) Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0692 College Savings Plans of Maryland - Maryland College Savings Account Plan - Authorization Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1100 Fiduciary Institutions - Disclosure of Financial Records - Federal Investigation Agencies Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0515 (HB0558/CH0095) Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM