Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Institutions (I1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142 (SB0033)
Title
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 /CH0253
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Mortgage Lender - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568
Title
Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a Setoff
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0591
Title
Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 /CH0266 (SB0206/CH0265)
Title
Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - Residency
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770 (SB0916)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Student Education Loan Servicers
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134 /CH0781 (SB0884/CH0018)
Title
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1376
Title
Real Property - Mortgages - Substitution of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499
Title
Consumer Protection - Bank Overdraft Plans - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 (HB0142)
Title
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0265 (HB0718/CH0266)
Title
Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - Residency
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0884 /CH0018 (HB1134/CH0781)
Title
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916 (HB0770)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Student Education Loan Servicers
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 /CH0479
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Surety Bond Requirements for Licensees and Registrants
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0142 (SB0033) Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0182 /CH0253 Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0247 Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0525 Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Mortgage Lender - Definition Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0568 Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a Setoff Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0591 Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0718 /CH0266 (SB0206/CH0265) Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - Residency Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0770 (SB0916) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Student Education Loan Servicers Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1134 /CH0781 (SB0884/CH0018) Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission Delegate Frick 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1376 Real Property - Mortgages - Substitution of Surviving Spouse Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Holmes)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 Consumer Protection - Bank Overdraft Plans - Requirements Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0004 Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0033 (HB0142) Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0206 /CH0265 (HB0718/CH0266) Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - Residency Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0884 /CH0018 (HB1134/CH0781) Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0916 (HB0770) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Student Education Loan Servicers Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0924 /CH0479 Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Surety Bond Requirements for Licensees and Registrants Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM