Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088 (SB0199/CH0205)
Title
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334 /CH0295 (SB0589/CH0294)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 (SB0465)
Title
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - Subordination
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1167
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Cards - Surcharge on Sales Transactions - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195
Title
Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on Rentals
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Consumer Protection - Payment by Credit Card - Prohibition of Surcharge
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297 /CH0330 (SB0897/CH0329)
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199 /CH0205 (HB0088)
Title
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 (HB0522)
Title
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - Subordination
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 /CH0294 (HB0334/CH0295)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0897 /CH0329 (HB1297/CH0330)
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 (SB0199/CH0205) Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens Delegate Arora 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0334 /CH0295 (SB0589/CH0294) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase Transactions Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Economic Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0522 (SB0465) Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - Subordination Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1167 Consumer Protection - Credit Cards - Surcharge on Sales Transactions - Prohibition Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1195 Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on Rentals Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB1218 Consumer Protection - Payment by Credit Card - Prohibition of Surcharge Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1297 /CH0330 (SB0897/CH0329) Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings Delegate Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0199 /CH0205 (HB0088) Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0465 (HB0522) Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - Subordination Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
SB0589 /CH0294 (HB0334/CH0295) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase Transactions Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0897 /CH0329 (HB1297/CH0330) Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM