Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0583/CH0306)
Title
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032
Title
Consumer Debt Collection - Statute of Limitations (Maryland Zombie Debt Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527
Title
Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure Timeline
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 /CH0306 (HB0735)
Title
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0735 (SB0583/CH0306) Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts Delegate Olszewski 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1032 Consumer Debt Collection - Statute of Limitations (Maryland Zombie Debt Act) Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1272 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1527 Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure Timeline Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0583 /CH0306 (HB0735) Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM