Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530
Title
Credit Regulation - Motor Vehicle Sales - Assignment of Financing Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0665)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783
Title
Consumer Protection - Collection and Sale of Consumer Debt - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159 (SB0773)
Title
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1450 /CH0393 (SB0471/CH0392)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037
Title
Commercial Law - Security Freezes - Fees for Active Duty Military Service Members
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 /CH0392 (HB1450/CH0393)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0665 (HB0782)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773 (HB1159)
Title
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855
Title
Commercial Law - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1132
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and Fee
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0530 Credit Regulation - Motor Vehicle Sales - Assignment of Financing Agreements Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0782 (SB0665) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0783 Consumer Protection - Collection and Sale of Consumer Debt - Restrictions Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 (SB0773) Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1450 /CH0393 (SB0471/CH0392) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1451 Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0037 Commercial Law - Security Freezes - Fees for Active Duty Military Service Members Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 /CH0392 (HB1450/CH0393) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0665 (HB0782) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0773 (HB1159) Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions President 6 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0855 Commercial Law - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow Accounts Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1132 Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and Fee Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page