Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 /CH0827 (SB0270/CH0828)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Mortgage Lender - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134 /CH0781 (SB0884/CH0018)
Title
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1166 (SB0893)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive Consideration
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 /CH0724 (SB0527/CH0723)
Title
Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1376
Title
Real Property - Mortgages - Substitution of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400 (SB1098)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0203
Title
Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 /CH0828 (HB0212/CH0827)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0283
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 /CH0484
Title
Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative Disclosures
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0527 /CH0723 (HB1270/CH0724)
Title
Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0884 /CH0018 (HB1134/CH0781)
Title
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893 (HB1166)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive Consideration
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1098 (HB1400)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1101
Title
Reverse Mortgages - Property Tax and Insurance Payments - Notice
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0212 /CH0827 (SB0270/CH0828) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0525 Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Mortgage Lender - Definition Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1134 /CH0781 (SB0884/CH0018) Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission Delegate Frick 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1166 (SB0893) Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive Consideration Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 /CH0724 (SB0527/CH0723) Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 724
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1376 Real Property - Mortgages - Substitution of Surviving Spouse Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Holmes)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 (SB1098) Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0203 Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 /CH0828 (HB0212/CH0827) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0283 Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow Accounts Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0392 /CH0484 Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative Disclosures Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0527 /CH0723 (HB1270/CH0724) Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 723
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0884 /CH0018 (HB1134/CH0781) Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0893 (HB1166) Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive Consideration Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1098 (HB1400) Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1101 Reverse Mortgages - Property Tax and Insurance Payments - Notice Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM