Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285
Title
Consumer Protection - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Security Freezes - Call Center
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297 /CH0790
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511 /CH0844
Title
Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1647
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 /CH0845
Title
Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0340
Title
Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1285 Consumer Protection - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Security Freezes - Call Center Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1297 /CH0790 Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Aumann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 790
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1511 /CH0844 Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee Delegate Mautz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1513 Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1647 Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 /CH0845 Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee Senator Serafini 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 845
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0755 /CH0340 Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM