Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416
Title
Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504
Title
Telephone Communications Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568 (SB0587)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661 (SB0861)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 (SB0700)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0453
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - "Mug Shot" Web Sites
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 (SB0557)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012
Title
Homeowner's Insurance and Renter's Insurance - Adjustment and Settlement Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Consumer Protection - Maryland Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 (HB0760)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587 (HB0568)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678
Title
Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB0670)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0661)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0416 Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0504 Telephone Communications Consumer Protection Act Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0568 (SB0587) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0661 (SB0861) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Delegate Zucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0670 (SB0700) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers Delegate Frick 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 /CH0453 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - "Mug Shot" Web Sites Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0760 (SB0557) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1012 Homeowner's Insurance and Renter's Insurance - Adjustment and Settlement Practices Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1094 Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Consumer Protection - Maryland Telephone Consumer Protection Act Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0548 Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0557 (HB0760) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0587 (HB0568) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0678 Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0700 (HB0670) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0661) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM