Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052 (SB0065)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 /CH0103 (SB0613)
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0532)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065 (HB0052)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB1019)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB0786/CH0103)
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0052 (SB0065) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0786 /CH0103 (SB0613) Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1019 (SB0532) Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0065 (HB0052) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0532 (HB1019) Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0613 (HB0786/CH0103) Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM