Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Immigrants and Citizenship -see also- Residency

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272
Title
Higher Education - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Sanctuary Campus Status
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0598
Title
Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908
Title
Police Officer Certification Work Group - Eligibility of Individuals with Permanent Residency Status
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1074
Title
Courts - Sanctuary Programs - Citizen Standing to Seek Injunction
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208 (SB0616)
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 (SB1016)
Title
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354 (SB0842)
Title
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362 (SB0835)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366
Title
Labor and Employment - Number of Employees Granted H-1B or L-1 Visa - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1508 (SB1000)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1523 (SB1070)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Regional Education and Training Center
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130 /CH0282
Title
Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Principals
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616 (HB1208)
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830
Title
Correctional Facilities - Individual Subject to Immigration Detainer - Homeland Security Notification
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1362)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842 (HB1354)
Title
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883
Title
Municipal Elections - Voting by Individuals Not Lawfully Present in the United States
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1508)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1016 (HB1307)
Title
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070 (HB1523)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Regional Education and Training Center
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0272 Higher Education - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Sanctuary Campus Status Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0539 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0598 Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - Prohibition Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0908 Police Officer Certification Work Group - Eligibility of Individuals with Permanent Residency Status Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1074 Courts - Sanctuary Programs - Citizen Standing to Seek Injunction Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1208 (SB0616) Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Ramirez)
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1307 (SB1016) Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1354 (SB0842) Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017 Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1362 (SB0835) Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community Trust Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1366 Labor and Employment - Number of Employees Granted H-1B or L-1 Visa - Disclosure Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1508 (SB1000) Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1523 (SB1070) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Regional Education and Training Center Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB0130 /CH0282 Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Principals Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0616 (HB1208) Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0830 Correctional Facilities - Individual Subject to Immigration Detainer - Homeland Security Notification Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0835 (HB1362) Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust Act Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0842 (HB1354) Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017 Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0883 Municipal Elections - Voting by Individuals Not Lawfully Present in the United States Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1000 (HB1508) Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1016 (HB1307) Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1070 (HB1523) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Regional Education and Training Center Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM