Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Immigrants and Citizenship -see also- Residency

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308
Title
State and Local Correctional Facilities - Undocumented Immigrants - Transfer to United States Department of Homeland Security (Keep Our Communities Safe Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1461
Title
Criminal Procedure – Immigration – Supporting All Families Everywhere (SAFE Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493 (SB0526)
Title
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1526 (SB0344)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1549
Title
Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1589
Title
Maryland Office for Refugees and Asylees - Placement Information (Unaccompanied Alien Children Placement Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1613 (SB1239/CH0749)
Title
Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian - Adverse Immigration Action
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1626
Title
Public Information Act - Motor Vehicle Administration - Warrant or Subpoena for Personal Information
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122
Title
Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 (HB1526)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357
Title
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0526 (HB1493)
Title
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581
Title
Victims and Witnesses – U Nonimmigrant Status – Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1276)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1239 /CH0749 (HB1613)
Title
Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian – Adverse Immigration Action
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0461 Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3)
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1308 State and Local Correctional Facilities - Undocumented Immigrants - Transfer to United States Department of Homeland Security (Keep Our Communities Safe Act of 2018) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1326 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1461 Criminal Procedure – Immigration – Supporting All Families Everywhere (SAFE Act) Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1493 (SB0526) Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1526 (SB0344) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act) Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1549 Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - Prohibition Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1589 Maryland Office for Refugees and Asylees - Placement Information (Unaccompanied Alien Children Placement Transparency Act) Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1613 (SB1239/CH0749) Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian - Adverse Immigration Action Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1626 Public Information Act - Motor Vehicle Administration - Warrant or Subpoena for Personal Information Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018 Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0344 (HB1526) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0357 Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2018 Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0526 (HB1493) Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 Victims and Witnesses – U Nonimmigrant Status – Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1276) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1239 /CH0749 (HB1613) Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian – Adverse Immigration Action Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 749
Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
4/09/2018 - 7:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM