Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Immunization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 /CH0502
Title
Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1332 (SB0783)
Title
Public Health – Human Papillomavirus Vaccine – Information and Informed Consent (Christina’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 (HB1332)
Title
Public Health - Human Papillomavirus Vaccine - Information and Informed Consent
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0316 /CH0502 Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1332 (SB0783) Public Health – Human Papillomavirus Vaccine – Information and Informed Consent (Christina’s Law) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0783 (HB1332) Public Health - Human Papillomavirus Vaccine - Information and Informed Consent Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM