Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Indigent Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0153
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606 (SB0733)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Revival Center of Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 /CH0545 (SB0764/CH0544)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164 (SB0773)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1395
Title
Harford County - Hotel Rental Tax
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0733 (HB0606)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Revival Center of Renewal
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764 /CH0544 (HB0823/CH0545)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773 (HB1164)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0153 Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0606 (SB0733) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Revival Center of Renewal Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
HB0823 /CH0545 (SB0764/CH0544) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1164 (SB0773) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing Expansion Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1395 Harford County - Hotel Rental Tax Delegate James 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0733 (HB0606) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Revival Center of Renewal Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 3:00 PM
SB0764 /CH0544 (HB0823/CH0545) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0773 (HB1164) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing Expansion Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM