Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Inheritance Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198 /CH0293
Title
Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1707
Title
Inheritance Tax - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0198 /CH0293 Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – Exemption Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1374 Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1707 Inheritance Tax - Repeal Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0980 Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM