Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Inheritance Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 /CH0435 (SB0192)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0636 (SB0510)
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 (HB0099/CH0435)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 /CH0197
Title
Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 /CH0225
Title
Tax Liens - Expiration
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510 (HB0636)
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 /CH0435 (SB0192) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0636 (SB0510) Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
SB0192 (HB0099/CH0435) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0398 /CH0197 Code Revision - Estates and Trusts President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0484 /CH0225 Tax Liens - Expiration Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0510 (HB0636) Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM