Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

International Affairs -see also- Foreign Trade

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 /CH0710 (SB0934/CH0711)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 /CH0834 (SB0875/CH0833)
Title
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1787
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0014
Title
Support for the People of Iran
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 /CH0833 (HB0981/CH0834)
Title
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 /CH0711 (HB0800/CH0710)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0800 /CH0710 (SB0934/CH0711) State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 710
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0981 /CH0834 (SB0875/CH0833) Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1787 State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0014 Support for the People of Iran Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0875 /CH0833 (HB0981/CH0834) Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 /CH0711 (HB0800/CH0710) State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 711
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM