Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judgments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733
Title
Courts - Civil Court Records - Shielding
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942
Title
Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential Tenancy
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0951/CH0568)
Title
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 (SB0869)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409
Title
Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0626 (SB1128)
Title
Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1611
Title
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazard and Sexual Harassment (Sunshine in Litigation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1649
Title
Public Safety – Police Misconduct and Civil Rights Actions – Settlement Database
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0572
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB1267)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 /CH0568 (HB1112)
Title
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1128 (HB1456/CH0626)
Title
Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1210
Title
Criminal Procedure - Extradition - Duty of Local Governments (Sanctuary for Citizens Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0733 Courts - Civil Court Records - Shielding Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0942 Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential Tenancy Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1112 (SB0951/CH0568) Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1267 (SB0869) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act) Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1456 /CH0626 (SB1128) Offshore Drilling Liability Act Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB1611 Courts - Concealment of Public Hazard and Sexual Harassment (Sunshine in Litigation Act) Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1649 Public Safety – Police Misconduct and Civil Rights Actions – Settlement Database Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0572 Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees Senator Benson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0869 (HB1267) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0951 /CH0568 (HB1112) Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1128 (HB1456/CH0626) Offshore Drilling Liability Act Senator Mathias 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1210 Criminal Procedure - Extradition - Duty of Local Governments (Sanctuary for Citizens Act) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM