Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Review -see also- Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070 (SB0151)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 (SB0272/CH0655)
Title
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile Court
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 (SB0760)
Title
Education - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628 /CH0613 (SB0517/CH0614)
Title
Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within Departments
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810 /CH0257
Title
Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 (HB0070)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164
Title
Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0225
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272 /CH0655 (HB0279)
Title
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile Court
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0760 (HB0497)
Title
Education - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 (SB0151) State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0279 (SB0272/CH0655) Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile Court Delegate Moon 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Judiciary
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0497 (SB0760) Education - Grounds for Discipline Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0628 /CH0613 (SB0517/CH0614) Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within Departments Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0810 /CH0257 Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0151 (HB0070) State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0164 Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0225 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0272 /CH0655 (HB0279) Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile Court Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0760 (HB0497) Education - Grounds for Discipline Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0832 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM