Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Review -see also- Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238 /CH0443 (SB0747)
Title
Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0418 (SB0824)
Title
Juvenile Law - Waiver and Transfer of Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0988
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sentencing Guidelines - Review
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320 (SB0869)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB0238/CH0443)
Title
Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 (HB0418)
Title
Juvenile Law - Waiver and Transfer of Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB1320)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 /CH0770
Title
Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1016
Title
Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0238 /CH0443 (SB0747) Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Ways and Means
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0418 (SB0824) Juvenile Law - Waiver and Transfer of Jurisdiction Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0988 Criminal Procedure - Sentencing Guidelines - Review Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 (SB0869) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0747 (HB0238/CH0443) Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0824 (HB0418) Juvenile Law - Waiver and Transfer of Jurisdiction Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0869 (HB1320) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Finance
SB1004 /CH0770 Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1016 Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM