Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juries -see also- Grand Juries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589
Title
Firearms Freedom Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 (SB0609)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Retaliation by Employer - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Employer Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0787
Title
Criminal Law - Reckless Endangerment - Repeal of Specific Charging Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0480
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder on School or Child Care Facility Property
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 (HB0595)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Retaliation by Employer - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0589 Firearms Freedom Act Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0595 (SB0609) Workers' Compensation - Retaliation by Employer - Prohibition Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0599 Courts - Jury Service - Employer Compensation Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0787 Criminal Law - Reckless Endangerment - Repeal of Specific Charging Requirement Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0480 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder on School or Child Care Facility Property Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 (HB0595) Workers' Compensation - Retaliation by Employer - Prohibition Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM