Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juries -see also- Grand Juries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354 (SB0842)
Title
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1459 (SB0682)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0682 (HB1459)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842 (HB1354)
Title
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1187
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1354 (SB0842) Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017 Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1459 (SB0682) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0682 (HB1459) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0842 (HB1354) Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017 Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1187 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM