Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264 /CH0611
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Records - Disclosure
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0544 (SB0491)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588 (SB0473/CH0474)
Title
Baltimore City - Children - Records Access
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 /CH0497 (SB0536/CH0496)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Graduated Responses - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679
Title
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnant Detainees and Inmates - Restraint Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916 /CH0651 (SB0791)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125 (SB0388)
Title
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297 /CH0330 (SB0897/CH0329)
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 (SB0939)
Title
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320 /CH0413
Title
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338 /CH0677
Title
Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup PG 306-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1377 (SB0956)
Title
State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory Board
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388 (HB1125)
Title
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395
Title
Juvenile Services - State-Licensed Facilities - Size Limit Exception - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0474 (HB0588)
Title
Baltimore City - Children - Records Access
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491 (HB0544)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0536 /CH0496 (HB0604/CH0497)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Graduated Responses - Report
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678
Title
Juvenile Services - Community-Based Diversion Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB0916/CH0651)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0897 /CH0329 (HB1297/CH0330)
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1307)
Title
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0956 (HB1377)
Title
State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory Board
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0264 /CH0611 Juvenile Law - Juvenile Records - Disclosure Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0544 (SB0491) Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications Delegate Serafini 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0588 (SB0473/CH0474) Baltimore City - Children - Records Access Delegate Anderson 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0604 /CH0497 (SB0536/CH0496) Department of Juvenile Services - Graduated Responses - Report Delegate Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0679 Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Requirement Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0829 Correctional Services - Pregnant Detainees and Inmates - Restraint Restrictions Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 /CH0651 (SB0791) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1125 (SB0388) Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1297 /CH0330 (SB0897/CH0329) Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings Delegate Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 (SB0939) Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 /CH0413 Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Extension Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1338 /CH0677 Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup PG 306-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Ways and Means
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1377 (SB0956) State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory Board Delegate James 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0388 (HB1125) Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 Juvenile Services - State-Licensed Facilities - Size Limit Exception - Repeal Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0442 Residential Child Care Programs - Memorandum of Understanding Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0473 /CH0474 (HB0588) Baltimore City - Children - Records Access Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0491 (HB0544) Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0536 /CH0496 (HB0604/CH0497) Department of Juvenile Services - Graduated Responses - Report Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0678 Juvenile Services - Community-Based Diversion Pilot Program Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB0916/CH0651) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0897 /CH0329 (HB1297/CH0330) Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0939 (HB1307) Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Requirement Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0956 (HB1377) State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory Board Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM