Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0212 (SB0656)
Title
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151 /CH0216
Title
Juvenile Services - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245 (SB0922/CH0205)
Title
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0135
Title
Juvenile Law - Committed Facilities - Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118 /CH0033
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Services Education - Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0027/CH0212)
Title
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0864
Title
Task Force on Assistance for Families of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 /CH0205 (HB1245)
Title
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0212 (SB0656) Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0151 /CH0216 Juvenile Services - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Reporting Requirement Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0994 Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1245 (SB0922/CH0205) Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0116 /CH0135 Juvenile Law - Committed Facilities - Extension of Termination Date Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0118 /CH0033 Juvenile Law - Juvenile Services Education - Facilities Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 (HB0027/CH0212) Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0864 Task Force on Assistance for Families of Homicide Victims Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 /CH0205 (HB1245) Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM