Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0751 /CH0629
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Court-Ordered Services Provider
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811
Title
Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855 /CH0555 (SB0439/CH0554)
Title
Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and Reinstatement
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463 (SB0317/CH0063)
Title
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0655 (SB1072)
Title
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081
Title
Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189
Title
Juveniles - Restraint and Searches - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 /CH0063 (HB1463)
Title
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325
Title
Juvenile Services Education - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 /CH0554 (HB0855/CH0555)
Title
Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and Reinstatement
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1072 (HB1634/CH0655)
Title
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0751 /CH0629 Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Court-Ordered Services Provider Delegate Sanchez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0811 Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human Trafficking Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0855 /CH0555 (SB0439/CH0554) Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and Reinstatement Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1463 (SB0317/CH0063) Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership Delegate Patterson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1634 /CH0655 (SB1072) Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System Delegate Jalisi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0081 Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination Date Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0189 Juveniles - Restraint and Searches - Limitations Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0317 /CH0063 (HB1463) Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 Juvenile Services Education - Modifications Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0439 /CH0554 (HB0855/CH0555) Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and Reinstatement Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1072 (HB1634/CH0655) Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM