Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Workers' Compensation (K1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205 /CH0589
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484
Title
Workers' Compensation - Average Weekly Wage - Multiple Employers
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 /CH0207 (SB0403/CH0208)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning Experiences
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Complex Regional Pain Syndrome
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1497 (SB0852)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability - Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 /CH0533 (SB0575)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1500 /CH0534 (SB0979/CH0535)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1592 /CH0221 (SB0851/CH0222)
Title
Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. - Designation as Employer and Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0048 /CH0588
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0403 /CH0208 (HB0814/CH0207)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning Experiences
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575 (HB1499/CH0533)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825
Title
Baltimore City - Sheriff's Office - Appointments, Salaries, and Workers' Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 /CH0222 (HB1592/CH0221)
Title
Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. – Designation as Employer and Membership
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852 (HB1497)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability - Credit
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979 /CH0535 (HB1500/CH0534)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Third-Party Actions - Subsequent Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1207
Title
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Partial Disability - Concurrent Employment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0205 /CH0589 Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Economic Matters
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0484 Workers' Compensation - Average Weekly Wage - Multiple Employers Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0814 /CH0207 (SB0403/CH0208) Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning Experiences Delegate Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 Workers’ Compensation – Complex Regional Pain Syndrome Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1497 (SB0852) Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability - Credit Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 /CH0533 (SB0575) Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud Reporting Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Economic Matters
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1500 /CH0534 (SB0979/CH0535) Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury Fund Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Economic Matters
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1592 /CH0221 (SB0851/CH0222) Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. - Designation as Employer and Membership Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Economic Matters
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0048 /CH0588 Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0403 /CH0208 (HB0814/CH0207) Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning Experiences Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0575 (HB1499/CH0533) Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud Reporting Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0825 Baltimore City - Sheriff's Office - Appointments, Salaries, and Workers' Compensation Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0851 /CH0222 (HB1592/CH0221) Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. – Designation as Employer and Membership Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0852 (HB1497) Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability - Credit Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0979 /CH0535 (HB1500/CH0534) Workers' Compensation - Third-Party Actions - Subsequent Injury Fund Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1207 Workers' Compensation - Temporary Partial Disability - Concurrent Employment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM