Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unemployment Insurance (K2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700 (SB0679/CH0574)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail Technicians
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334 (SB0777/CH0697)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Messenger Service Business
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1605
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Safe Harbor - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1633 (SB1145)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Maximum Benefit - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074 /CH0336
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Effect of Retirement Payments on Eligibility for Benefits - Revision
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084 /CH0337
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Calculation and Application of Table of Rates - Revision
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0339
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Actively Seeking Work Requirement - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0342
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679 /CH0574 (HB0700)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail Technicians
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777 /CH0697 (HB1334)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Messenger Service Business
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1145 (HB1633)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Maximum Benefit - Increase
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0700 (SB0679/CH0574) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail Technicians Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1334 (SB0777/CH0697) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Messenger Service Business Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1605 Unemployment Insurance - Safe Harbor - Establishment Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1633 (SB1145) Unemployment Insurance - Maximum Benefit - Increase Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0074 /CH0336 Unemployment Insurance - Effect of Retirement Payments on Eligibility for Benefits - Revision Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0084 /CH0337 Unemployment Insurance - Calculation and Application of Table of Rates - Revision Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0339 Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Actively Seeking Work Requirement - Repeal Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 /CH0342 Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0679 /CH0574 (HB0700) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail Technicians Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0777 /CH0697 (HB1334) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Messenger Service Business Senator Astle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1145 (HB1633) Unemployment Insurance - Maximum Benefit - Increase Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM