Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unemployment Insurance (K2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060 /CH0091
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336 /CH0001 (SB0391/CH0002)
Title
Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 (SB0444)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Bulk Vending Item Assembly
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128 (SB0493)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Contribution and Employment Reports - Required Information (Workforce Data Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 /CH0002 (HB0336/CH0001)
Title
Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 (HB0453)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Bulk Vending Item Assembly
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB1128)
Title
Workforce Data Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0060 /CH0091 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 /CH0001 (SB0391/CH0002) Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Economic Matters
1/31/2019 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0453 (SB0444) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Bulk Vending Item Assembly Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1128 (SB0493) Unemployment Insurance - Contribution and Employment Reports - Required Information (Workforce Data Act of 2019) Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 /CH0002 (HB0336/CH0001) Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0444 (HB0453) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Bulk Vending Item Assembly Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0493 (HB1128) Workforce Data Act of 2019 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM