Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Kent County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272 (SB0041)
Title
Kent County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273 (SB0089)
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 (SB0147)
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 (SB0795)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 (HB0272)
Title
Kent County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089 (HB0273)
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 (HB0290)
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795 (HB1244)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0272 (SB0041) Kent County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0273 (SB0089) Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0290 (SB0147) Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1244 (SB0795) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 (HB0272) Kent County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0089 (HB0273) Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0147 (HB0290) Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0795 (HB1244) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM