Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Municipal Corporations (L3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0025
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0213
Title
Local Government - Permit Review and Explanation of Denial
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0991)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489
Title
Municipalities - Incorporation Referendums - Special Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 /CH0103
Title
Municipal Elections - Campaign Finance Reports - Submission of Copies to the State Board of Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261 (SB0397)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0269 /CH0050
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - Voting Offenses, Penalties, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397 (HB1261)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0501
Title
Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State Ballot
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 (HB0422)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0025 Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting Delegate George 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0213 Local Government - Permit Review and Explanation of Denial Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0422 (SB0991) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0489 Municipalities - Incorporation Referendums - Special Elections Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 /CH0103 Municipal Elections - Campaign Finance Reports - Submission of Copies to the State Board of Elections Delegate Summers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1261 (SB0397) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites Delegate Frank 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
SB0269 /CH0050 Local Government - Municipal Elections - Voting Offenses, Penalties, and Enforcement Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0397 (HB1261) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 /CH0501 Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State Ballot Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 (HB0422) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM