Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Municipalities (L3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0544 /CH0241 (SB0288/CH0242)
Title
City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147 (SB0401)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288 /CH0242 (HB0544/CH0241)
Title
City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 (HB1147)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0544 /CH0241 (SB0288/CH0242) City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 241
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1147 (SB0401) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0288 /CH0242 (HB0544/CH0241) City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 242
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0401 (HB1147) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:56 PM