Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bi-County Agencies (L5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973 /CH0628
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commission Infractions - Watershed Regulations PG/MC 102-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Upgrade of Facilities PG/MC 108-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Affordability Program PG/MC 103-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043 /CH0441
Title
Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking PG/MC 112-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1071
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George's County Fair Share Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0973 /CH0628 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commission Infractions - Watershed Regulations PG/MC 102-14 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Upgrade of Facilities PG/MC 108-14 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0975 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Affordability Program PG/MC 103-14 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1043 /CH0441 Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1334 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking PG/MC 112-14 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1071 Montgomery County and Prince George's County Fair Share Act of 2014 Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM