Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bi-County Agencies (L5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221 /CH0159
Title
Prince George's County - Utility Services - Master Meters Task Force - Extension PG 407-19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 /CH0161
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited in Contracts MC/PG 107-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325 /CH0162
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Indirect Customer Assistance Program MC/PG 105-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 /CH0163
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362 /CH0562
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC/PG 109-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621
Title
Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification MC/PG 106-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647 (SB0202)
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 /CH0165
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Glenn Dale Hospital Property MC/PG 110-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0674
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Moratorium and Study on Advanced Metering Infrastructure MC/PG 101-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678 /CH0166
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County Recreation Programs - Youth Sports Program and Division MC/PG 115-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Mandatory Referral Review
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 /CH0354
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Procurement - Source Selection MC/PG 112-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1280 /CH0563
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 (HB0647)
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0221 /CH0159 Prince George's County - Utility Services - Master Meters Task Force - Extension PG 407-19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Economic Matters
1/31/2019 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0324 /CH0161 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited in Contracts MC/PG 107-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0325 /CH0162 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Indirect Customer Assistance Program MC/PG 105-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0326 /CH0163 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 /CH0562 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC/PG 109-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0621 Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification MC/PG 106-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0647 (SB0202) Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0662 /CH0165 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Glenn Dale Hospital Property MC/PG 110-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0674 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Moratorium and Study on Advanced Metering Infrastructure MC/PG 101-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0678 /CH0166 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County Recreation Programs - Youth Sports Program and Division MC/PG 115-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0859 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Mandatory Referral Review Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1279 /CH0354 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Procurement - Source Selection MC/PG 112-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1280 /CH0563 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0202 (HB0647) Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM