Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labeling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0561)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 (SB0413/CH0496)
Title
Health Occupations - Dentists With Permits to Dispense Dental Products - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy Act
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303 /CH0593 (SB0412)
Title
Health Occupations - Licensed Dentists Who Dispense Antibiotics - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy Act
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0421
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB0658)
Title
Marijuana Control Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079 /CH0487
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191 (SB0778)
Title
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0011
Title
Agriculture - Fertilizer - Labeling and Restrictions on Use and Sale
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0341 /CH0486
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412 (HB0303/CH0593)
Title
Health Occupations - Licensed Dentists Who Dispense Antibiotics - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy Act
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0413 /CH0496 (HB0301)
Title
Health Occupations - Dentists With Permits to Dispense Dental Products - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy Act
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561 (HB0210)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB0880)
Title
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 (HB1191)
Title
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0856
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0061 Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0210 (SB0561) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0301 (SB0413/CH0496) Health Occupations - Dentists With Permits to Dispense Dental Products - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy Act Delegate Reznik 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0303 /CH0593 (SB0412) Health Occupations - Licensed Dentists Who Dispense Antibiotics - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy Act Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0421 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permits Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0880 (SB0658) Marijuana Control Act of 2014 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0913 Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers Delegate James 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1079 /CH0487 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1191 (SB0778) Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0070 /CH0011 Agriculture - Fertilizer - Labeling and Restrictions on Use and Sale Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0341 /CH0486 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0394 Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0412 (HB0303/CH0593) Health Occupations - Licensed Dentists Who Dispense Antibiotics - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy Act Senator Dyson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0413 /CH0496 (HB0301) Health Occupations - Dentists With Permits to Dispense Dental Products - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy Act Senator Dyson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0561 (HB0210) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 (HB0880) The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0778 (HB1191) Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0856 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1092 Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM