Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Labeling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0364
Title
Hospital and Nursing Facility Workers and Health Care Practitioners - Identification Tags and Badges - Name Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0957)
Title
Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Farm Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959 (SB0872)
Title
Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017
Title
Public Health - Cottage Food Product Labels - Identification Number
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173 (SB0760)
Title
Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1317 (SB0953)
Title
Medical Cannabis - Dispensary Grower-Processor License
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 (SB0877)
Title
Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1486 (SB0752)
Title
Public Health – Non–Controlled Substance Prescription Record System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1568 (SB0943)
Title
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Added Flavoring - Prohibition on Shipping, Import, or Sale
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188
Title
Public Health - Misbranded Food - Meat Products
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 (HB0003)
Title
Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351
Title
Agriculture - Farmers Markets - Advertising, Labeling, and Enforcement (Farmers Market Integrity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555
Title
Consumer Protection - Unit Pricing - Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0760 (HB1173)
Title
Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 (HB0959)
Title
Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874 (HB1483)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1330)
Title
Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953 (HB1317)
Title
Medical Cannabis - Dispensary Grower-Processor License
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 (HB0784)
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1075
Title
Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0305 Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0364 Hospital and Nursing Facility Workers and Health Care Practitioners - Identification Tags and Badges - Name Requirement Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0784 (SB0957) Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0799 Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Farm Equipment Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0959 (SB0872) Health Insurance - Consumer Protections Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1017 Public Health - Cottage Food Product Labels - Identification Number Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1173 (SB0760) Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1317 (SB0953) Medical Cannabis - Dispensary Grower-Processor License Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 (SB0877) Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1486 (SB0752) Public Health – Non–Controlled Substance Prescription Record System Program Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1568 (SB0943) Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act) Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 Electronic Smoking Devices - Added Flavoring - Prohibition on Shipping, Import, or Sale Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0188 Public Health - Misbranded Food - Meat Products Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0233 (HB0003) Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0351 Agriculture - Farmers Markets - Advertising, Labeling, and Enforcement (Farmers Market Integrity Act) Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0555 Consumer Protection - Unit Pricing - Alcoholic Beverages Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0760 (HB1173) Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0872 (HB0959) Health Insurance - Consumer Protections Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0874 (HB1483) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1330) Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0953 (HB1317) Medical Cannabis - Dispensary Grower-Processor License Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 (HB0784) Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1075 Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/24/2020 7:56 AM