Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Laboratories

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0531 (SB0600/CH0530)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906
Title
Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 (SB0746)
Title
Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Treatment, Certification, Licensing, and Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227
Title
Health - Medical Laboratories - Advertising for or Soliciting Business - Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0530 (HB0742/CH0531)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0746 (HB1226)
Title
Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0742 /CH0531 (SB0600/CH0530) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0906 Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1030 Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1226 (SB0746) Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - Regulation Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1321 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Treatment, Certification, Licensing, and Registration Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
SB0227 Health - Medical Laboratories - Advertising for or Soliciting Business - Repeal of Prohibition Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0530 (HB0742/CH0531) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0746 (HB1226) Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - Regulation Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM