Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Laboratories

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655 (SB0392)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681
Title
Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870 (SB1065)
Title
Public Schools - Agricultural Education Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0907
Title
Medical Cannabis – Limit on the Number of Licensed Growers – Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008 (SB1087)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Invasive Cardiovascular Professionals
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201 (SB0946)
Title
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Laboratory Act
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1700
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1705
Title
Health - Job-Related Drug Testing - Breath Tests for Alcohol
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108 /CH0661
Title
Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB0655)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946 (HB1201)
Title
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Laboratory Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1065 (HB0870)
Title
Public Schools - Agricultural Education Programs
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1087 (HB1008)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Invasive Cardiovascular Professionals
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0652 Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders Delegate West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0655 (SB0392) Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0681 Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0870 (SB1065) Public Schools - Agricultural Education Programs Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0907 Medical Cannabis – Limit on the Number of Licensed Growers – Repeal Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1008 (SB1087) State Board of Physicians - Invasive Cardiovascular Professionals Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1201 (SB0946) Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Laboratory Act Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1700 Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1705 Health - Job-Related Drug Testing - Breath Tests for Alcohol Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0108 /CH0661 Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0392 (HB0655) Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0946 (HB1201) Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Laboratory Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1065 (HB0870) Public Schools - Agricultural Education Programs Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1087 (HB1008) State Board of Physicians - Invasive Cardiovascular Professionals Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM