Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labor and Industry, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0192
Title
Occupational Safety and Health - Inspections and Assessments of Civil Penalties - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 (SB0777)
Title
Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 (SB0040)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 (SB0279)
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478
Title
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage Records, Wages, and Paydays - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0695
Title
Public Safety - Vertical Reciprocating Conveyors - Safety Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 (SB0688)
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1027
Title
Labor and Employment - Overwork Prohibition Act
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051 (SB0424)
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 (HB0385)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 (HB0404)
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0424 (HB1051)
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0425
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage Disclosure and Discussion Protection
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB0969)
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777 (HB0370)
Title
Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0192 Occupational Safety and Health - Inspections and Assessments of Civil Penalties - Limitations Delegate Serafini 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB0370 (SB0777) Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 (SB0040) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 PM
HB0404 (SB0279) Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0478 Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - Prohibition Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0528 Labor and Employment - Wage Records, Wages, and Paydays - Requirements Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0695 Public Safety - Vertical Reciprocating Conveyors - Safety Standards Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0969 (SB0688) Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1027 Labor and Employment - Overwork Prohibition Act Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1051 (SB0424) Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 (HB0385) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0279 (HB0404) Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0424 (HB1051) Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0425 Labor and Employment - Wage Disclosure and Discussion Protection Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0688 (HB0969) Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0777 (HB0370) Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM