Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labor and Industry, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0098 (SB0135)
Title
Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 (SB0377)
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage History Information
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540
Title
Labor and Employment - Pre-Tax Transportation Fringe Benefit - Requirement (Maryland Pre-Tax Commuter Benefit Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541
Title
Labor and Employment – Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0543)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107 /CH0337 (SB0831)
Title
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262
Title
Healthy Working Families Act - Enforcement - Modifications (Healthy Working Families Enforcement Consistency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1417
Title
Healthy Working Families Act - Delay of Effective Date
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493 (SB0526)
Title
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1496
Title
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Against Medical Cannabis Patients and Caregivers - Prohibition (Medical Cannabis Patient and Caregiver Antidiscrimination Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1637
Title
Labor and Employment - Parking Cash-Out Program - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0098)
Title
Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235
Title
Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage - Indexing
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0304
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Delay of Effective Date
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368
Title
Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - Increase
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0377 (HB0512)
Title
Labor and Employment - Pay Scales and Wage History Information
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0526 (HB1493)
Title
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543 (HB0664)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0572
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831 (HB1107/CH0337)
Title
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1019
Title
Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - Increase
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1224
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0098 (SB0135) Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0180 Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew Delegate Stein 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0512 (SB0377) Labor and Employment - Wage History Information Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0540 Labor and Employment - Pre-Tax Transportation Fringe Benefit - Requirement (Maryland Pre-Tax Commuter Benefit Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0541 Labor and Employment – Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box) Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 (SB0543) Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1107 /CH0337 (SB0831) Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees Delegate Morales 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1262 Healthy Working Families Act - Enforcement - Modifications (Healthy Working Families Enforcement Consistency Act) Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1417 Healthy Working Families Act - Delay of Effective Date Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1493 (SB0526) Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1496 Labor and Employment - Discrimination Against Medical Cannabis Patients and Caregivers - Prohibition (Medical Cannabis Patient and Caregiver Antidiscrimination Act) Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1637 Labor and Employment - Parking Cash-Out Program - Requirement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0135 (HB0098) Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Finance
SB0235 Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage - Indexing Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0304 Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Delay of Effective Date Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/24/2018 - 2:30 PM
Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0368 Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - Increase Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0377 (HB0512) Labor and Employment - Pay Scales and Wage History Information Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0526 (HB1493) Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0543 (HB0664) Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen) Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0572 Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees Senator Benson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0831 (HB1107/CH0337) Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1019 Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - Increase Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1224 Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Modifications Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM