Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Labor and Industry, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0123 (SB0217)
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage History and Wage Range
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 (SB0434)
Title
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1048 (SB1011)
Title
Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0641)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Contracts - Employment After Contract Termination
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371 (SB0688)
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Construction Services - Stop Work Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410 (SB0062)
Title
Labor and Employment – Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1448
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Classification of Employees and Independent Contractors - Guidelines
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB1410)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - Order to Pay Wages
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 (HB0123)
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage History and Wage Range
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0434 (HB0722)
Title
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB1097)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB1371)
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Construction Services - Stop Work Orders
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0943 (HB1568)
Title
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991
Title
Apprenticeship and Training Council – Journeyworker–Apprentice Ratios – Electrical Craft or Trade
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011 (HB1048)
Title
Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0123 (SB0217) Labor and Employment - Wage History and Wage Range Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0722 (SB0434) Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1048 (SB1011) Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 (SB0641) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1143 Labor and Employment - Employment Contracts - Employment After Contract Termination Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1249 I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1371 (SB0688) Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Construction Services - Stop Work Orders Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1410 (SB0062) Labor and Employment – Secure Maryland Wage Act Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1448 Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Classification of Employees and Independent Contractors - Guidelines Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0062 (HB1410) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0119 Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - Order to Pay Wages Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0217 (HB0123) Labor and Employment - Wage History and Wage Range Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0434 (HB0722) Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0641 (HB1097) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0688 (HB1371) Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Construction Services - Stop Work Orders Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0943 (HB1568) Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 Apprenticeship and Training Council – Journeyworker–Apprentice Ratios – Electrical Craft or Trade Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1011 (HB1048) Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 11:15 AM