Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Landlord and Tenant -see also- Eviction; Leases & Rent; etc.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 (SB0404)
Title
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 (SB0480)
Title
Commission on Rental Housing Stabilization
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 /CH0428
Title
Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 /CH0455 (SB0408)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0824
Title
Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases and Just Cause Evictions
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0951
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Exemptions - Landlords
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 (SB0745)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Use for Unpaid Water and Sewer Bills
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1098
Title
Public Housing Authorities - Property Transfers - Rights and Benefits of Tenants
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Lead Risk Reduction Standards - Maintenance of Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0851)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 (HB0782/CH0455)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0480 (HB0420)
Title
Commission on Rental Housing Stabilization
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0745 (HB1082)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Use for Unpaid Water and Sewer Bills
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 (HB1232)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0270 (SB0404) Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0420 (SB0480) Commission on Rental Housing Stabilization Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0511 /CH0428 Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0782 /CH0455 (SB0408) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0824 Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases and Just Cause Evictions Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0951 Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Exemptions - Landlords Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1082 (SB0745) Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Use for Unpaid Water and Sewer Bills Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1098 Public Housing Authorities - Property Transfers - Rights and Benefits of Tenants Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 Lead Risk Reduction Standards - Maintenance of Exemptions Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1232 (SB0851) Real Property - Ground Rents Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0408 (HB0782/CH0455) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Muse 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0480 (HB0420) Commission on Rental Housing Stabilization Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0745 (HB1082) Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Use for Unpaid Water and Sewer Bills Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0762 Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0851 (HB1232) Real Property - Ground Rents Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM