Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Landscape Architects

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 /CH0139
Title
Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084
Title
State Board of Examiners of Landscape Architects - License Renewal - Continuing Professional Competency Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179
Title
Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0454
Title
Landscape Architects - License Renewal - Continuing Professional Competency Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0766 /CH0139 Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - Certification Delegate Frush 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0084 State Board of Examiners of Landscape Architects - License Renewal - Continuing Professional Competency Requirements Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0179 Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2013 - 1:45 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0280 /CH0454 Landscape Architects - License Renewal - Continuing Professional Competency Requirement Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2013 - 1:45 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page