Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Language

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0086
Title
Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527
Title
Labor and Employment - Earned Sick Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968 (SB0753)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing Education
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0753 (HB0968)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0086 Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - Establishment Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0527 Labor and Employment - Earned Sick Leave Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0968 (SB0753) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1404 Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing Education Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0753 (HB0968) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM