Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Laws and Ordinances -see also- Pub Local Laws; Uniform Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930 (SB0640)
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185 (SB0928)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1271 (SB0952)
Title
Business Regulation - Security Systems - Permitting and Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Prince George's County - Land Bank Authority PG 423-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1572
Title
Prince George's County - Authority to Prohibit the Use of Disposable Bags PG 422-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081
Title
Interstate Boating Violator Compact
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136
Title
Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political Subdivisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 (HB0930)
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 (HB1185)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0952 (HB1271)
Title
Business Regulation - Security Systems - Permitting and Registration
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0930 (SB0640) Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1185 (SB0928) Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1271 (SB0952) Business Regulation - Security Systems - Permitting and Registration Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 Prince George's County - Land Bank Authority PG 423-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1572 Prince George's County - Authority to Prohibit the Use of Disposable Bags PG 422-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0081 Interstate Boating Violator Compact Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0136 Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political Subdivisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Lee)
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 (HB0930) Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 (HB1185) Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0952 (HB1271) Business Regulation - Security Systems - Permitting and Registration Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM