Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Leave

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087 /CH0336 (SB0747/CH0335)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - Compensation
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216
Title
Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - Compensation for Unused Leave on Termination of Employment
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527
Title
Labor and Employment - Earned Sick Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 /CH0553 (SB0763/CH0552)
Title
Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0505)
Title
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968 (SB0753)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1026 /CH0334 (SB0737/CH0333)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1299
Title
Income Tax - Rate and Subtraction Modification - Parental Leave for Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1417 /CH0251
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147
Title
State Personnel - Employees in Legislative Branch of State Government - Sick Leave Incentive Program
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 (HB0935)
Title
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737 /CH0333 (HB1026/CH0334)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 /CH0335 (HB0087/CH0336)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0753 (HB0968)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0552 (HB0805/CH0553)
Title
Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 /CH0362
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Leave of Absence - Extension of Purchase Period
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0087 /CH0336 (SB0747/CH0335) Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - Compensation Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Ways and Means
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0216 Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - Compensation for Unused Leave on Termination of Employment Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0527 Labor and Employment - Earned Sick Leave Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 /CH0553 (SB0763/CH0552) Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0935 (SB0505) Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0968 (SB0753) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1026 /CH0334 (SB0737/CH0333) Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1299 Income Tax - Rate and Subtraction Modification - Parental Leave for Employees Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1417 /CH0251 Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0147 State Personnel - Employees in Legislative Branch of State Government - Sick Leave Incentive Program Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0505 (HB0935) Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 /CH0333 (HB1026/CH0334) Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0747 /CH0335 (HB0087/CH0336) Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - Compensation Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0753 (HB0968) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0552 (HB0805/CH0553) Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0939 /CH0362 State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Leave of Absence - Extension of Purchase Period Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM