Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Leave

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217 /CH0230 (SB0191)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0345 /CH0493
Title
Labor and Employment - Flexible Leave - Use of Leave for Family Illness
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 (SB0040)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 /CH0435
Title
State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0776 (SB0687)
Title
State Personnel - Parental Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 (HB0385)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 (HB0217/CH0230)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Peters
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0687 (HB0776)
Title
State Personnel - Parental Leave
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0217 /CH0230 (SB0191) State Retirement and Pension System - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Clarification Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
HB0345 /CH0493 Labor and Employment - Flexible Leave - Use of Leave for Family Illness Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 493
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 (SB0040) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 PM
HB0564 /CH0435 State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of Child Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0776 (SB0687) State Personnel - Parental Leave Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0985 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 (HB0385) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0191 (HB0217/CH0230) State Retirement and Pension System - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Clarification Senator Peters 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0687 (HB0776) State Personnel - Parental Leave Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM