Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Leave

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046 (SB0089)
Title
Small Business Relief Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0341
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861 /CH0347 (SB0829)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284 /CH0402 (SB0705)
Title
Organ Donation - Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB0681)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Temporary Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0392
Title
Maryland School for the Deaf - Employees - Annual and Personal Leave
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075
Title
Juvenile Services Education Program - Employees - Employment Contracts and Leave
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089 (HB0046)
Title
Small Business Relief Tax Credit – Alterations
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587
Title
State Personnel - Employee Organizations and Exclusive Representatives - Dues and Representation
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 (HB1300)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Temporary Workers
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB1284/CH0402)
Title
Organ Donation – Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751
Title
Governor’s Appointments Office, Appointing Authorities, and the Secretary of Budget and Management – Duties and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 (HB0861/CH0347)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0046 (SB0089) Small Business Relief Tax Credit - Expansion Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0341 Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2019) Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0861 /CH0347 (SB0829) State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
HB1284 /CH0402 (SB0705) Organ Donation - Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Finance
HB1300 (SB0681) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Temporary Workers Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0064 /CH0392 Maryland School for the Deaf - Employees - Annual and Personal Leave Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Finance
1/24/2019 - 2:30 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0075 Juvenile Services Education Program - Employees - Employment Contracts and Leave Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Finance
1/24/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0089 (HB0046) Small Business Relief Tax Credit – Alterations President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0500 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0587 State Personnel - Employee Organizations and Exclusive Representatives - Dues and Representation Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0681 (HB1300) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Temporary Workers Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 (HB1284/CH0402) Organ Donation – Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0751 Governor’s Appointments Office, Appointing Authorities, and the Secretary of Budget and Management – Duties and Reports Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0829 (HB0861/CH0347) State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave Senator Griffith 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM